Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Plaintiff: Golden State Salmon Association, Bay.Org, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Institute for Fisheries Resources, Defenders of Wildlife and Bay.Org Doing business as The Bay Institute
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Wilbur Ross, Bureau of Reclamation, Acting Director Margaret Everson, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith and Contra Costa Water District
Petitioner: People of the State of California, California Natural Resources Agency and California Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor: Provident Irrigation District, State Water Contractors, Maxwell Irrigation District, Oji Family Partnership, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co, River Garden Farms Water Company, Reclamation District No. 1004, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Meridian Farms Water Company, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Henry D. Richter, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Westlands Water District, Carter Mutual Water Company, Beverly F. Andreotti, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Reclamation District No. 108, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Howald Farms, Inc., Windswept Land and Livestock Company, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District and Conaway Preservation Group LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Oakdale Irrigation District, Knights Landing Investors, LLC, South San Joaquin Irrigation District and City of Redding
Case Number: 1:2020cv00431
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE of Supplemental Information by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service re #179 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 20, 2020 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit Temperature Management Plan, #3 Exhibit Attachments 1-12, #4 Exhibit Attachment 13)(Smith, Nicole)
May 21, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-CV-00426-DAD, 1:20-CV-00431-DAD by Center for Biological Diversity and Restore the Delta and Planning and Conservation League. (Buse, John) Modified on 5/21/2020 - changed name of filing party. (Thorp, J).
May 19, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE by All Defendants. (McDonald, Eve)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION ON REMAINING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ISSUES signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/18/2020. (Thorp, J)
May 15, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kenneth Michael Robbins on behalf of South San Joaquin Irrigation District. Attorney Robbins, Kenneth Michael added. (Robbins, Kenneth)
May 15, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE100045656 $1000.00 fbo Altshuler Berzon LLP by Altshuler Berzon LLP on 5/14/2020. (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2020 Filing 177 MOTION to INTERVENE by Oakdale Irrigation District, South San Joaquin Irrigation District. Attorney Wasiewski, Timothy J. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Knell, #2 Declaration of Peter Rietkerk, #3 Declaration of Timothy Wasiewski, #4 Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Granting Intervention)(Wasiewski, Timothy)
May 13, 2020 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5-7-20, Preliminary Injunction Hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2020. (Hooven, K)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/12/2020. The recently issued memorandum opinion and order #173 was inadvertently docketed twice. Accordingly, the second, identical version #174 is stricken from the record. (Thorp, J)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ***STRICKEN see Doc. #173 ***ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND HOLDING CERTAIN ISSUES IN ABEYANCE (Doc. No. #81 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2020. (Thorp, J) Modified on 5/12/2020 - Duplicate order (Thorp, J).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #81 AND HOLDING CERTAIN ISSUES IN ABEYANCE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2020. (Coffman, Lisa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms, Inc., Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company for proceedings held on 5/7/2020 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Nikkel, Meredith)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INTERVENTION OF CONTRA COSTA WATER DISTRICT signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/2020. (Thorp, J)
May 8, 2020 Filing 170 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice by All Defendants. (McDonald, Eve)
May 8, 2020 Filing 169 DECLARATION of Meredith E. Nikkel in opposition to #81 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,. (Nikkel, Meredith)
May 8, 2020 Filing 168 NOTICE of New Information by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(McDonald, Eve)
May 7, 2020 Filing 167 MINUTES (Text Only) for joint proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2020 cases 1:20-cv-00426-DAD-EPG and case 1:20-cv-00431-DAD-EPG. Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed in case 1:20-cv-00426-DAD-EPG argued. Plaintiffs' witness Doctor Bruce Herbold sworn and testified. Defendants' witness Kristin White sworn and testified. Plaintiffs' witness Jonathan Rosenfield sworn and testified. Any supplemental filings are to be filed no later than noon 5/8/2020. Motion is submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Sarah Van Loh, Jeffrey Reusch, Barbara Chisholm, Glen Spain and Elizabeth Vissers (Zoom) present. Defendants' Counsel Nicole Smith, Lori Carmanian and Lesley Lawrence-Hammer telephonically (Zoom) present. Defendants' Intervenors Counsel Dan O'Hanlon, Jenna Mandell-Rice, Rachel Jacobson, Meredith Nikkel, Andrew Hitchings and Matthew Adams (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven (Zoom) present (Thorp, J)
May 7, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of New Information by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Chisholm (Second Supplemental), #2 Exhibit AI to Second Supplemental Chisholm Declaration)(Vissers, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance of Lori Caramanian by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (McDonald, Eve)
May 5, 2020 Filing 164 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention of Contra Costa Water District by Contra Costa Water District. Attorney Bruner, Marc R. added. (Bruner, Marc)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2020. A hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is set for May 7, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. The hearing will be held via the Court's Zoom video conference system. Lawyers who plan to speak and any key witnesses must appear via Zoom. Parties will receive Zoom ID number and password for the hearing by email. All other interested parties who will not be speaking are to phone in telephonically by dialing 877-402-9757, access code 6966236 at the time of hearing. (Thorp, J)
April 27, 2020 Filing 162 STIPULATION re 159 Minute Order,,,,,,, by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Chisholm, Barbara)
April 24, 2020 Filing 161 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Vissers, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE OF NEW INFORMATION by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-6)(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/24/2020. As the court explained in a minute order issued on April 22, 20220 in the parallel case of California Natural Resource Agency v. Ross, 1:20-cv-00426 DAD EPG (CNRA), the court intends to set a joint hearing on the ripe preliminary injunction (PI) motion in this case #81 as well as on the recently-filed PI motion in CNRA, for either May 5, 6, or 7, 2020. The court requests that all parties in both cases attempt to reach agreement on at least one possible date and time for the hearing that would give the court at least 7 calendar days prior to the hearing date to review any opposition(s) to the PI motion in CNRA and at least four calendar days to review any replies. The parties are directed to inform the court of their election(s) on or before noon on Monday, 4/27/2020. (Thorp, J)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RELATING Cases and REASSIGNING Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2020. New Case Number: 1:20CV00431DADEPG. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rebecca R. Akroyd on behalf of San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority. Attorney Akroyd, Rebecca R. added. (Akroyd, Rebecca)
April 20, 2020 Filing 156 ANSWER by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
April 14, 2020 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. for proceedings held on 04/07/2020 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Chisholm, Barbara)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/14/2020. This court has received and reviewed preliminarily the papers filed in connection with the pending motion for preliminary injunction #81 , which is now fully briefed. Before this matter was transferred to this district, the motion was set for hearing on April 16, 2020. 101 In light of the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency issued March 25, 2020 #115 -1, motions before the undersigned are generally decided on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) without a hearing. Nonetheless, it is possible that a hearing may be helpful in this complex case. However, given the time expended by the court preparing for and hearing the recent application for a temporary restraining order and in light of the fact that the reply brief was not received until March 12, 2020, the court requires additional time to determine whether to hold a hearing, and, if so, to prepare for any such hearing. As a result, the April 16, 2020 hearing date is formally VACATED. The court is aware that operational conditions in the coming month may require rapid judicial attention. The parties are therefore directed to meet and confer to provide the court with a brief (no more than 7-pages combined) joint status report on or before April 24, 2020 outlining their respective positions as to whether operations may trigger the need for the court to accelerate a ruling on the preliminary injunction motion (or certain issues contained within that motion). (Thorp, J)
April 12, 2020 Filing 153 REPLY by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations re #86 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Barbara Chisholm in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Ex. AA to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. AB to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. AC to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. AD to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. AE to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. AF to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. AG to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #9 Exhibit Ex. AH to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #10 Exhibit Ex. X to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #11 Exhibit Ex. Y to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #12 Exhibit Ex. Z to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration)(Chisholm, Barbara)
April 12, 2020 Filing 152 RESPONSE by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations to #127 Opposition,,,,. (Chisholm, Barbara)
April 10, 2020 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for proceedings held on 04/07/20 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Smith, Nicole)
April 10, 2020 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, City of Redding, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Knights Landing Investors, LLC, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Reclamation District No. 1004 for proceedings held on 04/07/2020 before Judge Dale Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Hitchings, Andrew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-7-20, Temporary Restraining Order before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2020. (Hooven, K)
April 9, 2020 Filing 148 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations: Amended #145 Transcript Ordering Form Attorney Fuchs, Daniel M. added. (Fuchs, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 147 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #144 by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District for proceedings held on 4/7/20 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State Water Contractors for proceedings held on April 7, 2020 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
April 9, 2020 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations for proceedings held on 04/07/2020 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Fuchs, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District for proceedings held on 4/7/20 before Judge Hon. Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/8/2020. Pursuant to the court's instructions, plaintiffs have informally petitioned the court for relief from the existing deadline for their reply brief(s) in support of their motion for preliminary injunction. That request is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a single, consolidated brief no more than 40-pages in length by noon on April 12, 2020. (Thorp, J)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DENYING #131 Motion for TRO signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/07/2020. (Coffman, Lisa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 141 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2020. #131 Temporary Restraining Order argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiffs' Counsel Barbara Chisholm, Glen Spain and Elizabeth Vissers telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Nicole Smith and Lesley Lawrence-Hammer telephonically present. Defendants' Intervenors Counsel Dan O'Hanlon, Jenna Mandell-Rice, Meredith Nikkel and Andrew Hitchings telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven telephonically present. (Thorp, J)
April 6, 2020 Filing 140 REPLY by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations re #131 Motion for TRO,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Second Supplemental) of Barbara Chisholm in support of Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit K to Second Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #3 Exhibit L to Second Supplemental Chisholm Declaration, #4 Exhibit M to Second Supplemental Chisholm Declaration)(Vissers, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/2020; the parties are to appear telephonically for the #131 Temporary Restraining Order on calendar 4/7/2020 by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at 11:00am. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. Since counsel are appearing telephonically, all counsel are ORDERED to state your name for the court reporter each time you speak. (Thorp, J)
April 6, 2020 Filing 138 OPPOSITION by Intervenor Parties San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District to #131 Application,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Boardman, #2 Declaration Declaration of Charles H. Hanson, Ph.D.)(O'Hanlon, Daniel)
April 6, 2020 Filing 137 OPPOSITION by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to #131 Application,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second White Decl., #2 Exhibit White Exhibits, #3 Affidavit Brown Decl., #4 Affidavit Israel Decl., #5 Exhibit Israel Exhibits)(Smith, Nicole)
April 6, 2020 Filing 136 OPPOSITION by Intervenor State Water Contractors to #131 Application,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice)(Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER: The court has received and reviewed plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order #131 . Any opposition thereto must be filed in writing on or before 11:00 a.m. (Pacific Time) on Monday, April 6, 2020. The court sets a telephonic hearing on the matter for 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 7, 2020. The court will provide logistical details about the hearing as soon as possible. Signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/3/2020. (Coffman, Lisa)
April 3, 2020 Filing 134 DECLARATION of (Supplemental) Barbara Chisholm re #131 Application,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Supplemental Chisholm Declaration)(Chisholm, Barbara)
April 3, 2020 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations in Support of re #131 Application, filed by Bay.Org, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association. (Chisholm, Barbara)
April 3, 2020 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Barbara Chisholm re #131 Application,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Chisholm Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Chisholm Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Chisholm Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Chisholm Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Chisholm Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Chisholm Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Chisholm Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Chisholm Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Chisholm Declaration)(Chisholm, Barbara)
April 3, 2020 Filing 131 APPLICATION for a Temporary Restraining Order by Bay.Org, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Chisholm, Barbara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 130 RESPONSE by State Water Contractors to #86 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chandra S. Chilmakuri, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Shawn Acuna, Ph.D., #3 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice, #4 Declaration of Dennis D. Murphy)(Mandell-Rice, Jenna)
March 31, 2020 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Charles H. Hanson, Ph.D. re #126 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(O'Hanlon, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Thomas Boardman re #126 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Hanlon, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 127 OPPOSITION by Intervenor Parties Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms, Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company, Intervenor Defendants City of Redding, Knights Landing Investors, LLC to #86 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Attorney Nikkel, Meredith E. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Memorandum Objection to Evidence)(Nikkel, Meredith)
March 31, 2020 Filing 126 OPPOSITION by Intervenor Parties San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District to #86 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (O'Hanlon, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 125 ANSWER by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms, Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company, City of Redding, Knights Landing Investors, LLC. Attorney Hitchings, Andrew Morrow added.(Hitchings, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Intervention of City of Redding and Knights Landing Investors, LLC signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/31/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2020 Filing 123 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Intervention of City of Redding and Knights Landing Investors LLC by Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms, Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co, Oji Brothers Farm, Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700, LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company. Attorney Mueller, Jared Stanton added. (Mueller, Jared)
March 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING STATE WATER CONTRACTORS' MOTION FOR PERMISSIVE INTERVENTION WITH CONDITIONS ON BRIEFING #63 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/29/2020. (Coffman, Lisa)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/27/2020. This court has received and reviewed the motion to shorten time #64 re the motion to intervene filed by intervenor applicant State Water Contractors. The motion to intervene #63 is fully briefed. Moreover, in light of the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency issued March 25, 2020, #115 -1 the motion will be decided on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) without a hearing. As a result, the motion to shorten time is terminated as moot. The court is fully aware of the up-coming deadlines related to the pending preliminary injunction motion #81 and will endeavor to rule on the motion to intervene as soon as possible. (Thorp, J)
March 26, 2020 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Nicole Smith re #119 Opposition,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Smith, Nicole)
March 26, 2020 Filing 119 OPPOSITION by Defendants David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to #81 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit White Decl.)(Smith, Nicole)
March 26, 2020 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE re #116 Notice of Noncompliance with Electronic Filing Requirement: Disregard, Attorney was previously admitted under a different last name. (Gonzalez, R)
March 25, 2020 Filing 117 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorneys Eve W. McDonald, PHV and Glen Howard Spain, PHV to submit Pro Hac Vice Application to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
March 25, 2020 Filing 116 **Disregard** CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorney Brittany Kirsten Johnson, NCAED to submit Petition for Admission to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
March 25, 2020 Filing 115 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
March 25, 2020 Filing 114 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-07897.
March 23, 2020 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE TO PARTIES. So that the parties do not have to do this, the court will fed ex to the Eastern District this afternoon the chambers copies of all pending motions and the pleadings (in both cases). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER.In the attached order, the court grants the motions to transfer and transfers the case (and the related case of California Natural Resources Agency v. Ross, No. 20-cv-01299-LB) to the Eastern District of California. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 111 REPLY (re #63 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byState Water Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Pierre)(Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Intervenor Defendant Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Hitchings , Brittany K. Johnson, Stuart L. Somach, and Jared S. Mueller (Hitchings, Andrew) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 108 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: UPDATED CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR CMC/MOTION HEARING: The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone:Dial In: 877-336-1839Access Code: 8191201# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Pelton Clark for Intervenor-Defendant Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority (Clark, Andrea) (Filed on 3/18/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 106 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #63 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Chisholm in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Intervene by State Water Contractors, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chisholm Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Chisholm Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Chisholm Decl.)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 105 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority.. (Hamilton, Brian) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 104 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority. (Hamilton, Brian) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 103 CLERKS NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / MOTION HEARING: Through at least April 17, 2020, the court will not have any in-person civil case-management conferences or civil motions hearings and instead will have telephonic appearances. For motions hearings, the court is open to hearings by Skype for Business or Google Hangouts (because for now, the court cannot host conferences by Zoom). (This latter approach requires IT staff to provide the court with a web cam so there may be some delay.) Telephonic appearances generally are by CourtCall, but the court also circulates the following conference number, which can accommodate up to 200 people and allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 8191201#Security Code: 200326# (March 26, 2020 Hearing), 200409# (April 9, 2020 Hearing) and 200416# (April 16, 2020 Hearing). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (ejkS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re #99 Stipulation re Intervention. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/16/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part #100 Administrative Motion.Under the circumstances, the court does not wait the customary four days under the local rules and grants in part the motion for an extension of time at ECF No. 100. The court understands the plaintiffs' opposition to an extended briefing schedule based on their position in the parties' joint statement at ECF No. 89. The parties appear to agree on the need for a staggered briefing schedule but disagree on the timeline. The court appreciates the parties' continued effort to meet and confer to streamline case management. Finding good cause for an extension, the court extends the briefing schedule and modifies it as follows: Federal defendant's opposition: 3/26/2020Intervenor defendants' opposition: 3/31/2020Plaintiff's reply: 4/9/2020Motion hearing is continued one week to 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 100 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #86 Brief, #89 Statement filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Responses due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #77 MOTION to Shorten Time on SRS Contractors' Motion to Intervene, #75 MOTION to Intervene filed by Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co., Oji Brothers Farm Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrgation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company, Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District. (Hamilton, Brian) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve W. McDonald (McDonald, Eve) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Michael O'Brien (O'Brien, Kevin) (Filed on 3/12/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Edward Bivins (Bivins, Samuel) (Filed on 3/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Hamilton (Hamilton, Brian) (Filed on 3/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 94 CORRECTED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife. Bureau of Reclamation served on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; Brenda Burman served on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Mailing, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Affidavit of Mailing)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/11/2020) Modified on 3/12/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 93 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife. Bureau of Reclamation served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Brenda Burman served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Mailing, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Affidavit of Mailing, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Affidavit of Mailing)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/11/2020) Modified on 3/12/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 92 Response to #91 Non-Opposition by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/10/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 91 Non-Opposition to #64 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time by State Water Contractors (Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/10/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 90 Answer to First Amended Complaint #52 First Amended Complaint by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 89 Joint Statement Re: Pending Motions re 78 Case Management Conference - Initial by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 88 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RELATING CASE. The court finds that the cases are related C19-7897 LB and C20-1299 DMR. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/09/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 86 Brief re #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 85 Declaration of Barbara Chisholm in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 84 Declaration of Peter Moyle in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 83 Declaration of Noah Oppenheim in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 82 Declaration of Dr. Jonathan Rosenfield in Support of #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/19/2020. Replies due by 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 80 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER The court asks the parties to confer regarding the new related case, California Natural Resources Agency et. al. v. Ross et. al., 20-cv-1299-DMR, and the impact on the pending transfer motions and any anticipated briefing schedules. The court asks the parties to include this information in the joint statement due on Monday, March 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2020. Plaintiff agrees to a 30-page briefing with the regular briefing schedule. Parties are directed to meet and confer this date to discuss procedural issues and next steps and to file a joint statement on Monday, March 9, 2020. (Not Reported). Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Glen Spain, Barbara Chisholm and Elizabeth Vissers. Defendants' Attorneys (Phone): Lesley Lawrence-Hammer and Nicole Smith. Intervenor Defendants' Attorneys: (Phone) Rachel Jacobson and Jon Rubin, Carissa Beecham, Meredith Nikkel and Jared Mueller. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Shorten Time on SRS Contractors' Motion to Intervene filed by Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co., Oji Brothers Farm Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrgation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mueller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Mueller, Jared) (Filed on 3/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 76 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Beverly F. Andreotti, Carter Mutual Water Company, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Howald Farms Inc., Maxwell Irrigation District, Meridian Farms Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co., Oji Brothers Farm Inc., Oji Family Partnership, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Pelger Road 1700 LLC, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrgation District, Provident Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Reclamation District No. 108, Henry D. Richter, River Garden Farms Water Company, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company.. (Nikkel, Meredith) (Filed on 3/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Intervene filed by Reclamation District No. 108, Sutter Mutual Water Company, Natomas Central Mutual Water Co., River Garden Farms Water Company, Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company, Pelger Mutual Water Company, Meridian Farms Water Company, Howald Farms Inc., Oji Brothers Farm Inc., Henry D. Richter, Oji Family Partnership, Carter Mutual Water Company, Windswept Land and Livestock Company, Maxwell Irrigation District, Beverly F. Andreotti, Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company, Provident Irrigation District, Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrgation District, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, Reclamation District No. 1004, Conaway Preservation Group LLC, David and Alice teVelde Family Trust, Pelger Road 1700 LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/18/2020. Replies due by 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Sacramento River Settlement Contractors' Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Meredith E. Nikkel In Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of SRS Contractors' Motion to Intervene, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants/Intervenors' Motion to Intervene)(Nikkel, Meredith) (Filed on 3/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Relate Case 4:20-cv-01299-DMR filed by People of the State of California, California Natural Resources Agency, California Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Daniel Fuchs, #2 Proposed Order)(Fuchs, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #71 Stipulation to Appear by Phone. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Spain, Glen) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #70 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to appear by telephone at March 5 case management conference re 57 Order on Stipulation to appear by telephone at March 5 case management conference re 57 Order on Stipulation filed by Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 70 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to appear by telephone at March 5 case management conference re 57 Order on Stipulation filed by Westlands Water District. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Rachel) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 69 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State Water Contractors.. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Intervenor Defendant State Water Contractors shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS: According to Local Rule 7, motions must be noticed for a hearing not less than 35 days from filing. Due to the recent filing of #63 MOTION to Intervene, the court resets the hearing date from 4/7/2020 to 4/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. All other deadlines in the briefing schedule remain in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jenna Mandell-Rice representing Intervenor Defendant State Water Contractors. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY (re #56 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Overlength Briefs in Support of Preliminary Injunction Motion ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene filed by State Water Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Shorten Time)(McAdam, Allison) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Intervene filed by State Water Contractors. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/17/2020. Replies due by 3/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Pierre, #2 Declaration of Jenna Mandell-Rice, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #4 Proposed Answer of Intervenor-Defendant State Water Contractors to First Amended Complaint)(McAdam, Allison) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14239109.) filed by State Water Contractors. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #59 Administrative Motion To Appear Telephonically. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 60 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Overlength Briefs in Support of Preliminary Injunction Motion ) filed byDavid Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BOR CVP Op. Status Memo, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order)(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 3/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 59 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to appear by telephone at March 5 case management conference re 57 Order on Stipulation,, filed by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California ) filed byDavid Bernhardt, Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 2/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying #55 Stipulation. To discuss scheduling issues, the court keeps the case management conference currently set for 3/5/2020 on calendar. The court thus denies the parties' stipulation at ECF No. 55. The court, however, does not expect a full CMC statement from the parties. Instead, the parties should be prepared to discuss their views regarding scheduling for the pending and anticipated motion(s). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 56 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Overlength Briefs in Support of Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. Responses due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Chisholm in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Leave to File Overlength Briefs in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Motion for Leave to File Overlength Briefs in Support of Preliminary Injunction Motion)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/26/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/26/2020) Modified on 2/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 53 Proposed Summons. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 52 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Aurelia Skipwith, Brenda Burman, Bureau of Reclamation. Filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/24/2020) Modified on 2/25/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barbara Chisholm in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Federal Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of California, #2 Exhibit A to the Chisholm Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to the Chisholm Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to the Chisholm Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to the Chisholm Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to the Chisholm Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to the Chisholm Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to the Chisholm Declaration)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/5/2020. Replies due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 2/20/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 49 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 45 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 2/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California filed by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Souza, #3 Declaration Brown, #4 Declaration Smith, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 2/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #17 Motion to Intervene. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING: The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Thursday, January 30, 2020, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/22/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District.. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #31 Stipulation to Extend Federal Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 1/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Intervenors shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Vissers in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 1/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Stipulation to Extend Responsive Briefing Deadlines for Motion to Intervene. Responses due by 1/10/2020. Replies due by noon on 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/3/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 12/31/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 12/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel Jacobson representing Westlands Water District. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Jacobson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14002409.) filed by Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBITS re #17 MOTION to Intervene [Proposed] Answer to Complaint filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION to Intervene by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/3/2020. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations.. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #5 Notice (Other), by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 12/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Smith (Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 12/16/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Michelle Vissers (Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/4/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamilton Candee (Candee, Hamilton) (Filed on 12/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Howard Spain (Spain, Glen) (Filed on 12/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations CORRECTION OF DOCKET #4 (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/3/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13940149.). Filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, et al. v. Ross, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Provident Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State Water Contractors
Represented By: Jenna Mandell-Rice, PHV
Represented By: Allison Elaine McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Maxwell Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Oji Family Partnership
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natomas Central Mutual Water Co
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: River Garden Farms Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Reclamation District No. 1004
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Rebecca R. Akroyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pelger Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pleasant Grove-Verona Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Meridian Farms Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pelger Road 1700, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Henry D. Richter
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Oji Brothers Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Rachel Jacobson, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carter Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Beverly F. Andreotti
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sutter Mutual Water Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Reclamation District No. 108
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Andrea Clark
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tisdale Irrigation and Drainage Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Howald Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Windswept Land and Livestock Company
Represented By: Samuel E. Bivins
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: David and Alice teVelde Family Trust
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conaway Preservation Group LLC
Represented By: Stuart Leslie Somach
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Jared Stanton Mueller
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Represented By: Brian Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Brittany Kirsten Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Margaret Everson
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burman
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, PHV
Represented By: Lesley Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Eve W. McDonald, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Salmon Association
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.Org
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain, PHV
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain, PHV
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.Org Doing business as The Bay Institute
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: People of the State of California
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Natural Resources Agency
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Oakdale Irrigation District
Represented By: Timothy J. Wasiewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Knights Landing Investors, LLC
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: South San Joaquin Irrigation District
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: City of Redding
Represented By: Meredith E. Nikkel
Represented By: Andrew Morrow Hitchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?