Dakavia Management Corp., et al. v. Bigelow, et al.
Plaintiff: Dakavia Management Corp., Monte Vista Estates, LLC and Lamar Estates, LLC
Defendant: Brandon Bigelow, Razmik Zakarian, Richard A. Green, Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC, Chaim Raskin, SNF Payroll, LLC, SNF Management, LLC, LTC Investments, LLC, Invigorate Healthcare, Inc., Lamar Holdings, LLC, LTC Management Holdings, LLC, Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC, Curtis Bigelow and Invigorate Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00448
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the deadline for Defendants LTC MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, SNF PAYROLL, LLC, SNF MANAGEMENT, LLC and CHAIM RASKIN to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint be extended to Friday, June 12, 2020. (Gonzales, V)
May 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Abraham Mendez Andrade, III on behalf of Dakavia Management Corp., Lamar Estates, LLC, Monte Vista Estates, LLC. Attorney Andrade, Abraham Mendez added. (Andrade, Abraham)
May 21, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants LTC Management Holdings, LLC, SNF Payroll, LLC, SNF Management, LLC And Chaim Raskin To Respond To Initial Complaint By Not More Than 21 Days re #29 Stipulation, by Dakavia Management Corp., Lamar Estates, LLC, Monte Vista Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Saalfeld, Bryan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tami S. Smason on behalf of LTC Management Holdings, LLC, Chaim Raskin, SNF Management, LLC, SNF Payroll, LLC. Attorney Smason, Tami S. added. (Smason, Tami)
May 15, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants LTC Management Holdings, LLC, SNF Payroll, LLC, SNF Management, LLC and Chaim Raskin to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More than 28 Days by LTC Management Holdings, LLC, Chaim Raskin, SNF Management, LLC, SNF Payroll, LLC. Attorney Gross, Nicholas M. added. (Gross, Nicholas)
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Brandon Bigelow, Curtis Bigelow, Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC, Invigorate Healthcare, Inc., Invigorate Healthcare, LLC, Lamar Holdings, LLC, Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC* (Flores, E)
May 7, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brandon Bigelow, Curtis Bigelow, Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC, Invigorate Healthcare, Inc., Invigorate Healthcare, LLC, Lamar Holdings, LLC, Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC by Monte Vista Estates, LLC, Dakavia Management Corp., Lamar Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan L. P. Saalfeld in support of request to enter default)(Saalfeld, Bryan)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO SERVE DEFENDANT LTC MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, LLC THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/4/2020. (Kusamura, W)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Terminate Defendant LTC Investments, LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/23/2020. LTC Investments, LLC (a California Limited Liability Company) terminated. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Razmik Zakarian served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lamar Holdings, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Court Order to Serve California Secretary of State by Dakavia Management Corp., Lamar Estates, LLC, Monte Vista Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of ERRATA by Dakavia Management Corp. re #2 Complaint,.. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Dakavia Management Corp.. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: SNF Payroll, LLC served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: SNF Management, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Richard A. Green served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Invigorate Healthcare, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Invigorate Healthcare, Inc. served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Curtis Bigelow served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chaim Raskin served on 4/5/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brandon Bigelow served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Chaim Raskin, SNF Management, LLC, SNF Payroll, LLC, Razmik Zakarian* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld* *Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney* *580 California Street, Suite 1100* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Invigorate Healthcare, LLC, LTC Investments, LLC, LTC Management Holdings, LLC, Lamar Holdings, LLC, Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld* *Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney* *580 California Street, Suite 1100* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Brandon Bigelow, Curtis Bigelow, Richard A. Green, Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC, Invigorate Healthcare, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld* *Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney* *580 California Street, Suite 1100* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Lamar Estates, LLC. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Monte Vista Estates, LLC. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Dakavia Management Corp.. (Saalfeld, Bryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Breach of Written Contract against All Defendants by Monte Vista Estates, LLC, Dakavia Management Corp., Lamar Estates, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8816465) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint)(Saalfeld, Bryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dakavia Management Corp., Monte Vista Estates, LLC, Lamar Estates, LLC (Saalfeld, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakavia Management Corp., et al. v. Bigelow, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razmik Zakarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invigorate Healthcare Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Raskin
Represented By: Tami S. Smason
Represented By: Nicholas M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNF Payroll, LLC
Represented By: Tami S. Smason
Represented By: Nicholas M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNF Management, LLC
Represented By: Tami S. Smason
Represented By: Nicholas M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTC Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invigorate Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTC Management Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tami S. Smason
Represented By: Nicholas M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Vista Care Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invigorate Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakavia Management Corp.
Represented By: Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld
Represented By: Abraham Mendez Andrade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Vista Estates, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld
Represented By: Abraham Mendez Andrade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Estates, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Leland P. Saalfeld
Represented By: Abraham Mendez Andrade, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?