Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Pacific Elements, LLC
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Pacific Elements, LLC and Pacific Elements, LLC Doing business as Heartland Grains & Milling, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00449
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/18/2020. The new case number is 1:20-cv-00449-DAD-SKO. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Schroeder, Jeremy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Pacific Elements, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jacob D. Flesher* *Flesher Schaff & Schroeder, Inc.* *2202 Plaza Drive* *Rocklin, CA 95765*. (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pacific Elements, LLC dba Heartland Grains & Milling, LLC by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Attorney Flesher, Jacob D. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8817706) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flesher, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Pacific Elements, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Elements, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Elements, LLC Doing business as Heartland Grains & Milling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Jacob D. Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?