(PC) Reeves v. Dougherty et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Reeves
Defendant: E. McDaniel and S. Dougherty
Case Number: 1:2020cv00487
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Emmanuel Reeves. (Flores, E)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Request for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/28/2020. (Flores, E)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Order Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel by Emmanuel Reeves. (Flores, E)
April 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Emmanuel Reeves. (Flores, E)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/20/2020. (Flores, E)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Emmanuel Reeves. (Rivera, O)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Emmanuel Reeves. (Rivera, O)
April 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Emmanuel Reeves. (Rivera, O)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Emmanuel Reeves. (Rivera, O)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Emmanuel Reeves, CDC AI-5096 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
April 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Emmanuel Reeves. (Flores, E)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Emmanuel Reeves. (Flores, E)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against S. Dougherty, E. McDaniel by Emmanuel Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Reeves v. Dougherty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?