(PC) Young v. Broadaus, et al.
Plaintiff: Zuri Sana Kabisa Young
Defendant: Brian K. Cates, R. Cano, Gibbons, S. Tessanoori, R. Linares, Isaac Garza, A. Frye, Steven K. Broadaus, D. Carillo, C. Castellon, J. Serna, R Stephens and A Salazar
Case Number: 1:2020cv00539
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #16 by Plaintiff Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Marrujo, C)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
April 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), #17 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00539-NONE-JDP. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying #9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Requiring Payment of Filing Fee in Full Within Twenty-One Days; ORDER to Assign Case to District Judge (the new case number is 1:20-cv-00539-NONE-JDP), signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/20/2020. Objections to F&R Due Within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
April 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00476.
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REOPENING CASE; ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 14, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, filed byZuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Related document(s) #1 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why is is entitled to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. Responses due by 4/13/2020. Replies due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 10, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 10, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Receipt and Objection to the Clerk's Reassignment of the U.S. Magistrate Judge by Zuri Sana Kabisa Young (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.].
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 02/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) Modified on 2/5/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/2/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven K. Broadaus, R. Cano, D. Carillo, C. Castellon, Brian K. Cates, A. Frye, Isaac Garza, Gibbons, R. Linares, A. Salazar, J. Serna, R. Stephens, S. Tessanoori. Filed by Zuri Sana Kabisa Young. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Young v. Broadaus, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tessanoori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Linares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Broadaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Castellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuri Sana Kabisa Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?