(PC) Lisa Belyew v. Pallares
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: Mike Pallares
Case Number: 1:2020cv00623
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Findings and Recommendations; 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Lisa Belyew. (Lundstrom, T)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny #12 Motion for IFP and dismiss action without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2020. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T).
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00623-AWI-JLT-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion for Extension served on Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/11/2020. Motion for IFP due 45-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for 45-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File In Forma Pauperis Application by Lisa Belyew. (Rivera, O)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Lisa Belyew. (Marrujo, C)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Lisa Belyew. (Marrujo, C)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Lisa Belyew. (Jessen, A)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Lisa Belyew. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Mike Pallares by Lisa Belyew.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lisa Belyew v. Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?