(PC) Phillip Sanders v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Sanders
Defendant: Margaret Mims and Vang
Case Number: 1:2020cv00634
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Phillip Sanders. (Sant Agata, S)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/1/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Phillip Sanders. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Phillip Sanders. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Phillip Sanders (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Margaret Mims, Vang by Phillip Sanders.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Phillip Sanders v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?