Carson v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Frank Carson
Defendant: Marlissa Ferreira, City of Modesto, City of Ceres, Cory Brown, Jon Evers, Derek Perry, County of Stanislaus, David Harris, Kirk Bunch, Birgit Fladager and Steve Jacobson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00747
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
2 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED; (Zignago, K.)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2020 RELATING cases 1:13-cv-00311-TLN-BAM, 1:18-cv-00496-AWI-EPG, 1:18-cv-1403-DAD-SKO, 1:20-cv-00747-AWI-EPG, and 1:20-cv-00770-AWI-JDP. Actions denominated 1:18-cv-00496-AWI-EPG; 1:18-cv-1403-DAD-SKO; 1:20-cv-00747-AWI-EPG; and 1:20-cv-00770-AWI-JDP are REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, and the captions shall read, respectively, 1:18-cv-00496-TLN-BAM; 1:18-cv-1403-TLN-BAM; 1:20-cv-00747-TLN-BAM; and 1:20-cv-00770-TLN-BAM. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED, and the parties are ordered to refile any pending motions before this Court. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Zignago, K.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:15-cv-00311-TLN-BAM, 1:18-cv-01403-DAD-SKO, 1:18-cv-00496-AWI-EPG, 2:20-at-00526 by Frank Carson. (Walker, Jayme)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *David Harris, Steve Jacobson, Derek Perry* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jayme L. Walker* *Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli & Brewer* *1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1600* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Stanislaus, Jon Evers, Marlissa Ferreira, Birgit Fladager* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jayme L. Walker* *Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli & Brewer* *1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1600* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cory Brown, Kirk Bunch, City of Ceres, City of Modesto* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jayme L. Walker* *Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli & Brewer* *1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1600* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Frank Carson (Walker, Jayme)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by Frank Carson.(Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8910860) Attorney Walker, Jayme L. added. (Walker, Jayme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlissa Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birgit Fladager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Carson
Represented By: Randall E. Strauss
Represented By: Jayme L. Walker
Represented By: J Gary Gwilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?