Old Republic General Insurance Corporation v. Amtrust North America et al
Plaintiff: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Peerless Insurance Co., The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co., Liberty Surplus Insurance, Colony Specialty Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Co., Navigators Specialty Ins. Co., Everest Indemnity Ins. Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Hannover Group, Amtrust North America, International Ins. Co. of Hannover, Amtrust International Underwriters Ltd. and Colony Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00778
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Navigators Specialty Ins. Co., Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *A. Geoffrey Hutchinson* *Branson Brinkop Griffith and Campo* *643 Bair Island Road, Suite 400* *Redwood City, CA 94063-2159*. (Lundstrom, T)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2020: In light of the current posture of this case, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 is CONTINUED to 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amtrust International Underwriters Ltd., Colony Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *A. Geoffrey Hutchinson* *Branson Brinkop Griffith and Strong* *643 Bair Island Road, Suite 400* *Redwood City, CA 94063-2159*. (Rivera, O)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Amtrust, #2 Summons for Navigators, #3 Summons for Tokio Marine Specialty)(Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Everest Indemnity Ins. Co. served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Peerless Insurance Co. served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Liberty Surplus Insurance served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co. served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Colony Specialty Insurance Company served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Stipulation re: Second Amended Complaint and Answers Thereto, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/2020. (Hall, S)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Amended Complaint and Answers Thereto by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Second Amended Complaint and Answers Thereto)(Hutchinson, A.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Closing the Action as to Everest Indemnity Insurance Company Without Prejudice #9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/14/2020. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Hutchinson, A.)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Closing the Action as to Specially Appearing Defendant HDI Global Specialty SE, Erroneously Sued as Hannover Group Formerly Known as International Ins. Co. of Hannover Without Prejudice re #7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/2020. (Hall, S)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of HDI Global Specialty SE, f/k/a International Insurance Company of Hannover SE erroneously sued as Hannover Group (fka International Ins. Co. of Hannover) by Hannover Group. Attorney Lehavi, Limor added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lehavi, Limor)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Peerless Insurance Co., The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co..(Russum, Blake)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Peerless Insurance Co., The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co.. Attorney Russum, Blake J. added. (Russum, Blake)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jenni Khuu Katzer on behalf of U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Katzer, Jenni Khuu added. (Katzer, Jenni)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hutchinson, A.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Flores, E)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Kern, case number BCV-20-100862 by Old Republic General Insurance Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8921935) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure, #4 Declaration of Jenni Katzer in Support, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R)(McInnis, Terrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation v. Amtrust North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Insurance Co.
Represented By: Blake J. Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Ins. Co.
Represented By: Blake J. Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Surplus Insurance
Represented By: Stephen Lamar Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Terrence Reilly McInnis
Represented By: Jenni Khuu Katzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannover Group
Represented By: Limor Lehavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Ins. Co. of Hannover
Represented By: Limor Lehavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust International Underwriters Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
Represented By: A. Geoffrey Hutchinson
Represented By: John R. Campo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?