Yellowcake, Inc. v. Morena Music, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yellowcake, Inc.
Defendant: Morena Music, Inc. and Eduardo Leon
Case Number: 1:2020cv00787
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Eduardo Leon served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Morena Music, Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/8/2020. Added attorney Seth Berman, PHV for Yellowcake, Inc. (Rivera, O)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Yellowcake, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8978862) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Griffin, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eduardo Leon, Morena Music, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Griffin, Jr.* *Hefner Stark & Marois, LLP* *2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 450* *Sacramento, CA 95833*. (Rivera, O)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* SR0000863476 * * Sound Recording * * YELLOWCAKE, INC. * Copyright #2:* SR0000863553 * * Sound Recording * * YELLOWCAKE, INC. * Copyright #3:* SR0000864335 * * Sound Recording * * YELLOWCAKE, INC. * Copyright #4:* SR0000863321 * * Sound Recording * * YELLOWCAKE, INC. * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Yellowcake, Inc., a California corporation (Griffin, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGMENT, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants by Yellowcake, Inc., a California corporation. Attorney Griffin, Thomas P. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8924123) (Griffin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellowcake, Inc. v. Morena Music, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morena Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellowcake, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?