Yellowcake, Inc. v. Platino Records, et al
Plaintiff: Yellowcake, Inc.
Defendant: Alberto Mitchell, Maria Mitchell, Antoine Music, Inc. and Platino Records, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00796
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Yellowcake, Inc. re #12 Notice - Other. (Berman, Seth)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing by Yellowcake, Inc. re #5 Copyright New Case Documents for AWI,. (Berman, Seth)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Platino Records, Inc. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Antoine Music, Inc. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alberto Mitchell served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Maria Mitchell served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Griffin, Thomas)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/7/2020. Added attorney Seth Berman, PHV for Yellowcake, Inc. (Sant Agata, S)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Yellowcake, Inc. for attorney Seth L. Berman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8980658) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Griffin, Thomas)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* See Complaint * * * * * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Maria Mitchell, Platino Records, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Griffin, Jr.* *2150 River Plaza Drive* *Suite 450* *Sacramento, Ca 95833*. (Sant Agata, S)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antoine Music, Inc., Alberto Mitchell* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Griffin, Jr.* *2150 River Plaza Drive* *Suite 450* *Sacramento, Ca 95833*. (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by YELLOWCAKE, INC., a California corporation (Griffin, Thomas)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants by YELLOWCAKE, INC., a California corporation. Attorney Griffin, Thomas P. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8929005) (Griffin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellowcake, Inc. v. Platino Records, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellowcake, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platino Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?