(PC) Miller v. Kubicki, et al.
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Defendant: Kelly Santoro and Theodore Kubicki
Case Number: 1:2020cv00812
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #12 by Plaintiff Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ernest Miller. (Lundstrom, T)
June 29, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), #11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2020. Objections to F&R Due Within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00812-DAD-BAM. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Court Order re Reimbursement of Stamps, Pencils and Envelopes From Canteen Store, by Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Court Order re Medical Supplies and Money Funds to be Reimbursed Back, by Ernest Miller. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
June 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Ernest Miller. (Rivera, O)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions Prisoner) (Rivera, O)
June 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ernest Miller. (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-03659.
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. SEE ATTACHMENT #1 FOR SIGNED ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 8, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/9/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2020: #1 Signed Order) (kedS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 6/11/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/6/2020. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 6/11/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Theodore Kubicki, Kelly Santoro. Filed by Ernest Miller. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 6/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Miller v. Kubicki, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Kubicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?