(PC) Moore v. Diaz
Plaintiff: Terrence Jesse Moore
Defendant: Heather Diaz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00865
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Terrence Jesse Moore. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #13 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Terrence Jesse Moore. (Lundstrom, T)
August 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Terrence Jesse Moore. (Marrujo, C)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Declaration for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/6/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Heather Diaz by Terrence Jesse Moore. (Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Terrence Jesse Moore. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this case proceed on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Claims against Defendant Diaz for failure to protect and deliberate indifference to serious medical needs and Plaintiff's retaliation claim be dismissed re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2020. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00865 AWI-EPG (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
June 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Terrence Jesse Moore. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Terrence Jesse Moore. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Terrence Jesse Moore, CDC BB-4015 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *6/23/2020*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Terrence Jesse Moore. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Heather Diaz by Terrence Jesse Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Moore v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Jesse Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?