Christina Gonzalez et al. v. State of California
Plaintiff: Victoria Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Anjelica Gonzalez and Jewelina Gonzalez
Defendant: State of California, Ryan Patrik, Juan Vidal, Christopher Ceaser, Scott Whittaker, Kyle Nunez and Andrew Mack
Not Classified By Court: Kern County Department of Child Support Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00912
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Darrell York. (York, Darrell)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #51 Parties' Amended Joint Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend Expert Discovery to the extent that non-expert discovery is reopened for the limited purpose of deposing non-party Susie Castillo no later than June 21, 2022 and supplemental expert discovery is extended to July 21, 2022. All other dates currently scheduled in this matter remain unaffected by this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/12/2022. (Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #49 Parties' Joint Motion for Extension in light of Amended Joint Motion #51 filed 03/31/2022. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/12/2022. (Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Order Granting Amended Stipulation to Re-Open Discovery to Take the Deposition of Non-party Susie Castillo re 50 Minute Order,, by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/30/2022: Upon consideration of the parties' stipulation filed on March 25, 2022 (Doc. No. #49 ) addressing reopening discovery for the limited purposes of deposing a third party witness and amending the deadline for expert discovery, the Court requests the parties file an amended stipulation for the Court's consideration by March 31, 2022, addressing whether other remaining deadlines in the scheduling order, i.e. deadline to file dispositive motions, date of settlement conference, and date of pretrial conference, require further continuance. (Text Only Entry)(Hall, S)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Re-opening Discovery to Take the Deposition of Non-Party Witness, Susie Castillo by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/14/2022: On March 10, 2022, the parties filed a stipulation of dismissal of Defendants Ryan Patrick and Scott Whittaker with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Doc. No. [46 ]. In light of the stipulated dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court as to Defendants Ryan Patrick and Scott Whittaker. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of the Court shall terminate only Ryan Patrick and Scott Whittaker as Defendants from this case and Consolidated Case No. 1:20-cv-01298. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING (Doc. No. #45 ) Parties' Stipulation. Based upon the stipulation of the parties, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Second Amended Complaint in Case No. 1:20-CV-00912-JLT-BAK(HBK) and the First Amended Complaint in Consolidated Case No. 1:20-cv-01298 shall be deemed to be amended to eliminate the Second Cause of Action for Unreasonable Search and Seizure--Denial of Medical Care (42 U.S.C. 1983) in the pleadings. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 03/14/2022. (Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Christopher Ceaser, Andrew Mack, Kyle Nunez, Ryan Patrik, State of California, Juan Vidal, Scott Whittaker. (Dean, Donna)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION by Christopher Ceaser, Andrew Mack, Kyle Nunez, Ryan Patrik, State of California, Juan Vidal, Scott Whittaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION)(Dean, Donna)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/25/2022. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. Documents filed in this case shall continue to include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(HBK)* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate is appointed. (Rivera, O)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Helena Barch-Kuchta* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(HBK)* (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Christopher Ceaser, Andrew Mack, Kyle Nunez, Ryan Patrik, State of California, Juan Vidal, Scott Whittaker. (Dean, Donna)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #39 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/5/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline 2/15/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/14/2022; Hearing by 4/25/2022. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 8/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4. (Hall, S)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for CONTINUE CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES)(Galipo, Dale)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Robles, S)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #36 Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order to Continue Expert Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/7/2021. (Hall, S)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying the Scheduling Order to Continue the Initial Expert Disclosure, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure and Expert Discovery Cutoff Dates by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/22/2021: In light of the information contained in the joint report, the Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/3/2021 is VACATED. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete discovery within the time frames set forth in the scheduling order. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Galipo, Dale)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF LIEN by Kern County Department of Child Support Services. (Cramer, Keith)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF LEIN by Kern County Department of Child Support Services. Attorney Cramer, Keith Howard added. (Cramer, Keith)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Christopher Ceaser, Andrew Mack, Kyle Nunez, Ryan Patrik, Juan Vidal, Scott Whittaker.(Dean, Donna)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ryan Patrick* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dale K. Galipo* *Law Offices of Dale K. Galipo* *21800 Burbank Blvd., Suite 310* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Rivera, O)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) In light of the filing of a second amended complaint #28 pursuant to stipulation that provides a deadline for the State of California to file a responsive pleading #27 , the State's pending motion to dismiss #7 is denied as moot signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on March 17, 2021. (Munoz, I)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Ceaser, Andrew Mack, Kyle Nunez, Ryan Patrik, State of California, Juan Vidal, Scott Whittaker by Victoria Gonzalez, Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez.(Galipo, Dale)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/2021. (Hall, S)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Galipo, Dale)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Dale K. Galipo on behalf of Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. Attorney Galipo, Dale K. added. (Galipo, Dale)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Dean, Donna)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Donna M. Dean re #22 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction: Your filing is entitled CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, however, the actual document attached is Stipulated Protective Order. Please re-file your document using the correct event. Your document was filed incorrectly in this case. Please re-file your document in case number 1:20-cv-01298-NONE-JLT. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Flores, E)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Dean, Donna)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/2020. Lead Case: 1:20-cv-00912-NONE-JLT; Member Case: 1:20-cv-01298-NONE-JLT; Member Case Closed; all future filings to be made in lead case. (Lundstrom, T)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (York, Darrell)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Cases Should Not Be Consolidated for All Purposes, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/2020. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2020. (Hall, S)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez: Amended #17 Scheduling Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Conference Worksheet)(York, Darrell)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Conference Worksheet)(York, Darrell)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Garvey, Sarah)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Sarah Lou Ann Garvey terminated (York, Darrell)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MODIFIED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2020. (Hall, S)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Protective Order by State of California. (Dean, Donna)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/18/2020: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 09/29/2020 is CONTINUED to 12/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2020. (Hall, S)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for protective order by State of California. (Dean, Donna)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by State of California in SUPPORT of #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Dean, Donna)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Anjelica Gonzalez, Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (York, Darrell)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Dean, Donna)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of California by Christina Gonzalez, Victoria Gonzalez, Anjelica Gonzalez.(York, Darrell)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by State of California re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Dean, Donna)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS by State of California. (Dean, Donna)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Dean, Donna)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Kern, case number BCV-20-101246 by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dean, Donna)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number 0972-8967495 for $400.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Donna M. Dean. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christina Gonzalez et al. v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Represented By: Amie C. McTavish
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Patrik
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Vidal
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ceaser
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Whittaker
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Nunez
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mack
Represented By: Amie C. Bears
Represented By: Donna M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Gonzalez
Represented By: Sarah Lou Ann Garvey
Represented By: Darrell York
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gonzalez
Represented By: Sarah Lou Ann Garvey
Represented By: Darrell York
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjelica Gonzalez
Represented By: Sarah Lou Ann Garvey
Represented By: Darrell York
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewelina Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas A. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kern County Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Keith Howard Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?