Lynne Bloom et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson, Richard Bloom and Lynne Bloom
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00958
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING [86) #87 Applications of Christopher Gomez and Lee Balefsky to Appear PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs; ORDER DISCHARGING #85 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/29/2020. Attorney Christine V. Clarke terminated #83 . (Hall, S)
July 30, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9021765 for $225.00 for Lee B. Balefsky re #87 from Peter L Kaufman. (Gonzalez, R)
July 29, 2020 Filing 87 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom for attorney Lee B. Balefsky to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter)
July 29, 2020 Filing 86 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom for attorney Christopher A. Gomez to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kaufman, Peter Lawrence added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter)
July 29, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9023631 for $225.00 for Pro Hac Vice #86 for Christopher A. Gomez from Peter L. Kaufman. (Gonzalez, R)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER to Lee Balefsky to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for the Failure to Seek Admission to this Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2020. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2020 Filing 84 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appendices A, B and C, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Benedict, Mollie)
July 27, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY of Christine Clark by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/16/2020: In light of the Court's Order (Doc. #81 ) directing the parties to file a joint status report, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING MATTER and ORDER for Parties to Submit Status Information, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/14/2020. Case REASSIGNED to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, UnassignedDJ no longer assigned to the case. New Case Number: 1:20-cv-00958-AWI-JLT. Joint Status Report due within ten (10) days. (Rivera, O)
July 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #81 Order served on Christine V. Clarke. (Rivera, O)
July 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-cv-00958-NON, 1:20-cv-00044-AWI, 2:19-cv-02237-AWI, 1:20-cv-00818-AWI, 1:20-cv-00357-AWI, 2:20-cv-00787-AWI, 1:20-cv-00130-AWI, 1:20-cv-00129-AWI by Johnson & Johnson. (Benedict, Mollie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 79 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Worksheet, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
July 10, 2020 Filing 78 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorneys Christine V. Clarke, Lee B. Balefsky, Christy D. Jones, David B. Thomas, Susan M. Robinson, Caroline Dye Walker, William M. Gage: If you admitted to the California State Bar but not admitted to practice in this court, please fill out the attached Admission to Practice form. If you will be Pro Hac Vice, please fill out the attached Pro Hac Vice Application. (Attachments: #1 PHV Application) (Marrujo, C)
July 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #78 Docket Annotation, #79 Civil New Case Documents, served on Christine V. Clarke. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2020 Filing 77 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05672.
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSER OF VENUE by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS SO ORDERED: The above captioned matter is to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Case transferred electronically on 7/8/2020. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to USDC Eastern District of California filed by Plaintiffs Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #73 APPLICATION to Substitute Attorney. The following attorneys from Tucker Ellis LLP shall be counsel of record forDefendants Ethicon, Inc. and Ethicon, LLC: Mollie F. Benedict, State Bar No.; Joshua J. Wes, State Bar No.; and Nicholas V. Janizeh. Added attorney Joshua J Wes,Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh for Ethicon Inc,Joshua J Wes, Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh for Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Susan M Robinson; Matthew P Smith; David B Thomas; Caroline Dye Walker; William M Gage and Christy D Jones terminated. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 73 APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Mollie F. Benedict, Joshua J. Wes and Nicholas V. Janizeh in place of attorney Christy D. Jones, Caroline Dye Walker, Matthew P. Smith, William M. Gage, David B. Thomas and Susan M. Robinson filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft)) (Benedict, Mollie) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action for trial and a final pretrial conference are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The parties are ordered to meet and confer no later than July 10, 2020, to discuss case management and scheduling issues. Following their meeting, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than July 17, 2020. (Exhibit List due by 9/18/2020. Witness List due by 9/18/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions set for 10/19/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is an action recently transferred from the MDL Court for the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. Plaintiffs Lynne Bloom and Richard Bloom ("Plaintiffs") bring this action against defendants Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson ("Defendants") regarding the safety and effectiveness of Defendants' pelvic mesh products. It appears that this action's sole connection to this District is that Plaintiff's surgery occurred in Woodland Hills, California. According to the Short Form Complaint, venue is proper in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. According to the Plaintiffs Civil Cover Sheet, they reside in Kern County, California. Compare Watson v. Dow Corning Corp., 1993 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 6424 (N.D. Cal. May 4, 1993) (finding venue was proper in the Southern District of Alabama where Plaintiff resided and suffered injury of silicon implant leak because of product defect even though product was manufactured in California and implanted in Florida). For these reasons, the Court orders the parties to show cause, in writing not to exceed 15 pages, why this action should not be dismissed or transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California (the "Eastern District") for the convenience of the parties and witnesses and in the interest of justice. See 28 U.S.C. 1404. To assist the Court in determining whether transfer is appropriate and in the interest of justice, the parties are directed to address the following: (see document for details). The parties' responses to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed by no later than July 10, 2020. Failure to timely and adequately respond to this Order may result in the dismissal or transfer of this action without further warning. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William M. Gage. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew P. Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth Paul Conour. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Caroline Dye Walker. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan M. Robinson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David B. Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christy D. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lee B. Balefsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christine V. Clarke. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:17-cv-01960, from Southern District of West Virginia. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-05672 PA (RAOx). (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 56 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from West Virginia Southern [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 55 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (7349) Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (7462) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8751) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8878) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 54 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3614) Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3616) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3750) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3849) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8736) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8815) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8731) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8832) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8729) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8891) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 51 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8324) Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8325) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8401) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8721) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8908) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Jeppson)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 50 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2270) - Def's Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Def's Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8775) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8861) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Dionsyios Veronikis)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1996) - Def's Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1997) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2167) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2222) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2814) - Def's Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2816) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2950) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3011) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8769) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8851) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8779) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8842) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 47 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 46 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8804) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 4 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 5 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 6 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 7 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 8 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 9 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 10 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8805) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8829) Defs Exh in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8865) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #44 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/22/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 6/21/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/8/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #12 MOTION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke as Counsel in lieu of Khaldoun A. Baghdadi. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/3/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom of Andrew Cassidenti, MD on 12/18/2019 at 9:00 AM PDT (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #37 Memorandum In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom in opposition to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude or Limit the Case-Specific Opinions of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom in opposition to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude or Limit the Case-Specific Opinions of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom in opposition to #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom in opposition to #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom of Andrew Cassidenti, MD on 11/27/2019 at 9:00 AM PDT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude or Limit the Case-Specific Opinions of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom of Maureen Martin, MD on 11/07/2019 at 9:00 AM PDT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom of Andrew Cassidenti, MD on 11/06/2019 at 9:00 AM PDT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Collignon, NP on November 6, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. PST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Irving Shipkowitz on October 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. PDT (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Irving Shipkowitz on October 8, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. PDT (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Collignon on October 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Order No. 38, #2 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition)(Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Kevin Jovanovic on 10/10/2019 at 6:00 p.m. EDT (Attachments: #1 Amended Subpoena)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. on October 8, 2019 at 6:00 p.m. EDT (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Conour, Kenneth) (Modified on 8/28/2019 to remove link to #21 notice) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christopher Tarnay, M.D. on 09/18/2019 at 1:00 (PDT) (Attachments: #1 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Conour, Kenneth) (Modified on 8/28/2019 to remove link to #19 notice) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christopher Tarnay, M.D. on 09.18.19 at 1:00pm (PDT) (Attachments: #1 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Richard Bloom on 09/11/2019 at 1:00 p.m. PDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lynne Bloom on 09/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. PDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline Dye Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke as Counsel in lieu of Khaldoun A. Baghdadi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6503 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Christopher M. Tarnay on 4/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lynne Bloom, Richard Bloom. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 249 (Initial Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 02/23/2017 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]
March 21, 2017 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5443755. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/25/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 7/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynne Bloom et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Kenneth P. Conour
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker, PHV
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bloom
Represented By: Christine V. Clarke
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, NCAED
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, PHV
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Bloom
Represented By: Christine V. Clarke
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, NCAED
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, PHV
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Joshua James Wes
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Kenneth P. Conour
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker, PHV
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Conour
Represented By: Nicholas V. Janizeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?