Aries Gasification, LLC v. North Fork Community Power, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Aries Gasification, LLC
Defendant: EQTEC PLC, North Fork Community Power, LLC and Phoenix Biomass Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00961
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: North Fork Community Power, LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Phoenix Biomass Energy, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Auerbach, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2020. Added attorney Brian S.S. Auerbach for Aries Gasification, LLC. (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aries Gasification, LLC for attorney Brian S.S. Auerbach to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9013660) (Cox, Vincent)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/16/2020. Attorney, Lynn E. Rzonca added PHV for Aries Gasification, LLC.(Lundstrom, T)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aries Gasification, LLC for attorney Lynn E. Rzonca to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8993566) (Cox, Vincent)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 9,242,219 * * 1/26/2016 * * Aries Gasification, LLC * Patent #2:* 9,809,769 * * 11/7/2017 * * Aries Gasification, LLC * Patent #3:* 10,611,973 * * 4/7/2020 * * Aries Gasification, LLC * Patent #4:* 10,696,913 * * 6/30/2020 * * Aries Gasification, LLC * ; copy of Complaint and Patent Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *EQTEC PLC, North Fork Community Power, LLC, Phoenix Biomass Energy, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Vincent Cox* *Ballard Spahr LLP* *2029 Century Park East, Suite 800* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT by ARIES GASIFICATION, LLC. (Cox, Vincent)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ARIES GASIFICATION, LLC. (Cox, Vincent)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by ARIES GASIFICATION, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8986958) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aries Gasification, LLC v. North Fork Community Power, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQTEC PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Fork Community Power, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Biomass Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aries Gasification, LLC
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Lynn E. Rzonca, PHV
Represented By: Brian S.S. Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?