(HC) Segura v. Lizarraga
Petitioner: Jacob Juarez Segura
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga and Joe A. Lizarraqa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00990
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
August 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Marrujo, C)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00990-DAD-SKO.. (Marrujo, C)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitney, Charity)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charity Seraph Whitney on behalf of Joe A. Lizarraqa. Attorney Whitney, Charity Seraph added. (Whitney, Charity)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Consent / Decline Form served on Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/20/2020. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 9/24/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jacob Juarez Segura signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-04721.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 17, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Juarez Segura. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob Juarez Segura, CDCR # AY9177.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byJacob Juarez Segura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memo of P&A, #3 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Segura v. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraqa
Represented By: Charity Seraph Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Juarez Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?