(SS) Castillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Martin Castillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00991
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Martin Castillo pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Jessen, A)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Petition to Appoint Daniela Padraza Reyes as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff Martin Castillo, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/6/2020. (Hall, S)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/6/2020. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Martin Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to File a Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/20/2020. (Hall, S)
July 17, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Martin Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Martin Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Castillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Castillo
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?