Criswell et al v. Boudreaux
Plaintiff: Levi Johnson, Samuel Camposeco, Adam Ibarra, Charles Criswell and California Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Defendant: Michael Boudreaux
Case Number: 1:2020cv01048
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT of Compliance filed by Defendant Michael Boudreaux re #26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D Report to Court, #2 Exhibit E Supp Declaration of Kevin Silveira, #3 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED STATEMENT of Compliance filed by Defendant Michael Boudreaux re #26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 STATEMENT of Compliance filed by Defendant Michael Boudreaux re #26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy 716, #2 Exhibit WellPath Screening Form, #3 Exhibit Legal Visitation Information, #4 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND GRANTING MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, IN PART (Doc. Nos. #10 , #11 , #25 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/2/2020. (Thorp, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION Supplement to Def Opposition re #15 Response, by Michael Boudreaux. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Overview of Testing, #2 Exhibit 2. Duration of Isolation, #3 Exhibit 3. When to Quarantine, #4 Exhibit 4. Discontinuation of Transmission, #5 Exhibit 5. Discontinuation of Isolation, #6 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Kathleen Taylor re #22 Supplement: Your filing is entitled Supplement, however, the actual document attached is a Motion to Supplement. Please re-file your document using the correct event Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Rivera, O)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson to #22 Supplement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 McDermott Declaration)(McDermott, Sara)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT by Michael Boudreaux re #15 Response,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-26-20, Motions Hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2020. (Hooven, K)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson for proceedings held on August 26, 2020 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Teshuva, Ariel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2020. #10 Ex Parte Application for Provisional Class Certification and #11 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order to follow. Plaintiffs' Counsel Sara McDermott, Ariel Teshuva and Amy Gilbert (Zoom) present. Defendant's Counsel Kathleen Taylor (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson re #11 Ex Parte Application,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25 Supplemental McDermott Declaration, #2 Exhibit 26 Supplemental Verner-Crist Declaration)(McDermott, Sara)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson re #10 Ex Parte Application. (Teshuva, Ariel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Michael Boudreaux to #10 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Michael Boudreaux to #11 Ex Parte Application,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Macias, #3 Declaration Jones, #4 Declaration Lehner, #5 Declaration Silveira, #6 Declaration Robles, #7 Declaration Sigley, #8 Proof of Service)(Taylor, Kathleen)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/14/2020. On August 12, 2020, plaintiffs filed #10 an ex parte application for provisional class certification and #11 an ex parte application and motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. The court now sets a hearing on the pending applications and motion for August 26, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Parties will receive Zoom ID number and password for the hearing by email. All other interested parties who will not be speaking are to phone in telephonically by dialing 877-402-9757, access code 6966236 at the time of hearing. Defendant's oppositions to the pending applications and motion shall be filed by August 20, 2020, and plaintiffs' replies thereto shall be filed by August 24, 2020. (Thorp, J)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Kathleen A. Taylor for Michael Boudreaux (Taylor, Kathleen)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson re #11 Ex Parte Application,,,,, #10 Ex Parte Application. (McDermott, Sara)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson for Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC Re Preliminary Inunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 McDermott Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Goldenson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 Meyer Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 Bundy Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 Guneratne Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 Gilbert Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 Verner-Crist Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 Davidian Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 Alford Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 Bradbury Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 Camposeco Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 Supp Camposeco Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 Criswell Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 Escobar Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 Hernandez Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 Ibarra Declaration, #17 Exhibit 17 Johnson Declaration, #18 Exhibit 18 Supp Johnson Declaration, #19 Exhibit 19 Martinez Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20 Nunes Declaration, #21 Exhibit 21 Redmon Declaration, #22 Exhibit 22 Robinson Declaration, #23 Exhibit 23 Rodriguez Declaration, #24 Exhibit 24 Ward Declaration, #25 TRO Checklist, #26 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Sara)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson for Provisional Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Sara)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Boudreaux served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (McDermott, Sara)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Sara McDermott re #7 Certificate of Service: When filing a Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, please use the event Summons Returned Executed under the category, Service of Process. Please re-file your document using the correct event. (Jessen, A)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson re #3 Summons. (McDermott, Sara)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Teshuva, Ariel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Samuel Camposeco, Charles Criswell, Adam Ibarra, Levi Johnson re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (McDermott, Sara)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Michael Boudreaux* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Estalyn Smyke Marquis* *Munger Tolles & Olson* *350 South Grand Avenue, Floor 50* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9024161 for $400.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Estalyn Smyke Marquis. (Lundstrom, T)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charles CRISWELL, Levi Johnson (Marquis, Estalyn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Boudreaux in his official capacity as Sheriff of Tulare County by Charles CRISWELL, Levi Johnson. Attorney Marquis, Estalyn Smyke added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Marquis, Estalyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Criswell et al v. Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boudreaux
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Johnson
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Jacob S. Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ariel Tal Teshuva
Represented By: Omar Hamdy Noureldin
Represented By: Sara Ashley McDermott
Represented By: William David Temko
Represented By: Kathleen Guneratne
Represented By: Shilpi Agarwal
Represented By: Estalyn Smyke Marquis
Represented By: Amy Rose Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Camposeco
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Jacob S. Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ariel Tal Teshuva
Represented By: Omar Hamdy Noureldin
Represented By: Sara Ashley McDermott
Represented By: William David Temko
Represented By: Kathleen Guneratne
Represented By: Shilpi Agarwal
Represented By: Estalyn Smyke Marquis
Represented By: Amy Rose Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ibarra
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Jacob S. Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ariel Tal Teshuva
Represented By: Omar Hamdy Noureldin
Represented By: Sara Ashley McDermott
Represented By: William David Temko
Represented By: Kathleen Guneratne
Represented By: Shilpi Agarwal
Represented By: Estalyn Smyke Marquis
Represented By: Amy Rose Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Criswell
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Jacob S. Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ariel Tal Teshuva
Represented By: Omar Hamdy Noureldin
Represented By: Sara Ashley McDermott
Represented By: William David Temko
Represented By: Kathleen Guneratne
Represented By: Shilpi Agarwal
Represented By: Estalyn Smyke Marquis
Represented By: Amy Rose Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Represented By: Jacob S. Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ariel Tal Teshuva
Represented By: Omar Hamdy Noureldin
Represented By: Sara Ashley McDermott
Represented By: William David Temko
Represented By: Kathleen Guneratne
Represented By: Shilpi Agarwal
Represented By: Estalyn Smyke Marquis
Represented By: Amy Rose Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?