Lim v. County of Tulare et al
Plaintiff: Chong Sook Lim
Defendant: Unknown Public Employee 2, County of Tulare and Unknown Public Employee 1
Case Number: 1:2020cv01049
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and #4 First Screening Order served on Chong Sook Lim. (Rivera, O)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND SCREENING ORDER and ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff Copy of First Screening Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/2020. *30-Day Deadline.* (Rivera, O)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Chong Sook Lim. (Rivera, O)
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Chong Sook Lim. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/14/2020. Amended Complaint due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
July 31, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Chong Sook Lim. (Rivera, O)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/31/2020. (Rivera, O)
July 30, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Chong Sook Lim. (Marrujo, C)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Tulare, Unknown Public Employee 1, Unknown Public Employee 2 by Chong Sook Lim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lim v. County of Tulare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chong Sook Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Public Employee 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Public Employee 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?