(SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01054
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/2020. CASE STAYED. (Valdez, E)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Stay of Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2020. (Jessen, A)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2020. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2020. (Valdez, E)
July 30, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?