Federal Trade Commission v. Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., Stephen Meis, Huu Tieu and Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01060
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0053
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER by Stephen Meis.(McNamara, David)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., Huu Tieu.(La Costa, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER by Stephen Meis.(McNamara, David)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., Huu Tieu.(La Costa, Joseph)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph La Costa on behalf of Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., Stephen Meis, Huu Tieu. Attorney La Costa, Joseph added. (La Costa, Joseph)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/27/2020. In light of the #29 and #30 stipulations, the 9/2/2020 Preliminary Injunction hearing is VACATED. (Thorp, J)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Regarding Stipulation to Preliminary Injunction as to Defendants Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Huu Tieu, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/27/2020. (Rivera, O)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Regarding Stipulation to Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Stephen Meis, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/27/2020. (Rivera, O)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/2020. On August 21, 2020, defendants Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Huu Tieu (collectively, "the Golden Sunrise defendants") and plaintiff filed a #26 stipulation and proposed order regarding the pending #17 motion for a preliminary injunction. Attorney Edgar H. Sevilla III has signed the stipulation on behalf of the Golden Sunrise defendants. (See Doc. No. 26 at 3.) Attorney Sevilla, however, has not appeared in this action as attorney of record on behalf of any party. Accordingly, attorney Sevilla is directed to file a notice of appearance in this action on behalf of the Golden Sunrise defendants by noon on August 28, 2020. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on attorney Sevilla via email at the email address he has listed in the stipulation, licrdech@yahoo.com. (Thorp, J)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER by Stephen Meis.(McNamara, David)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Defendants Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Huu Tieu re #17 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Preliminary Injunction)(Keller, Zachary)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Stephen Meis re #17 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Preliminary Injunction (Meis))(Keller, Zachary)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/14/2020. Docket 23 ENTERED IN ERROR. Preliminary Injunction set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR *** MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/14/2020. The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J) Modified on 8/14/2020 (Thorp, J).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #16 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Order on Motion for TRO,. (Keller, Zachary)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #16 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Order on Motion for TRO,. (Keller, Zachary)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #16 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Order on Motion for TRO,. (Keller, Zachary)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #16 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Order on Motion for TRO,. (Keller, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of ERRATA by Federal Trade Commission re #17 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION .. (Keller, Zachary)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed PI, #2 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of PI, #3 Appendix Attachment A)(Keller, Zachary)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONF OR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Doc. No. #3 )signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/5/2020. Preliminary Injunction set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Plaintiff shall file its motion for preliminary injunction by August 7, 2020;Defendants shall file their oppositions to the motion by August 21, 2020; Plaintiff shall file any reply to the oppositions by August 28, 2020.) (Thorp, J)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2020. #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Edward Hynes, Zachary Keller, and Reid Tepfer (Zoom) present. Defendant Stephen Meis Counsel David McNamara (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Huu Tieu served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Keller, Zachary)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stephen Meis served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Keller, Zachary)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Keller, Zachary)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Keller, Zachary)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Stephen Meis, M.D.. Attorney McNamara, David R. added. (McNamara, David)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting briefing schedule and hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO #3 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/3/2020. (Filing Deadline: 8/4/2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Lundstrom, T)
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Steps Taken to Notify Defendants of Minute Order by Federal Trade Commission re 7 Minute Order,,,, #3 Motion for TRO. (Keller, Zachary)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/31/2020. On July 31, 2020, plaintiff filed #3 a motion for a temporary restraining order ("TRO"). In a declaration attached to the pending motion, plaintiff's counsel notes that plaintiff intends on notifying defendants of the filing of its complaint and its motion for a TRO in this action by phone and email and serving defendants via Federal Express. (Doc. No. 3-15 at 2.) Plaintiffs counsel noted that he would "file a supplemental Certificate of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 231(c)(5) after completing the steps discussed above" (id.), but no such supplemental filing has yet been received by the court. Nevertheless, the court has preliminarily reviewed the pending motion for a TRO and intends on granting the motion, unless defendants file an opposition and/or request a hearing by 2:00pm on Monday, August 3, 2020. Accordingly, plaintiff is hereby directed to serve this minute order on defendants and to thereafter file documentation with the court outlining the steps it has taken to effectuate such service. (Thorp, J)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Stephen Meis, Huu Tieu* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Alexander Keller* *Federal Trade Commission* *1999 Bryan St., Suite 2150* *Dallas, TX 75201*. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc., Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Alexander Keller* *Federal Trade Commission* *1999 Bryan St., Suite 2150* *Dallas, TX 75201*. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 TRO Checklist, #2 Proposed Order TRO, #3 Points and Authorities, #4 Appendix Volume 0 (Index), #5 Appendix Volume 1, #6 Appendix Volume 2, #7 Appendix Volume 3, #8 Appendix Volume 4, #9 Appendix Volume 5, #10 Appendix Volume 6, #11 Appendix Volume 7, #12 Appendix Volume 8, #13 Appendix Volume 9, #14 Declaration Irreparable Injury, #15 Declaration Notice)(Keller, Zachary)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. Attorney Keller, Zachary Alexander added. (Keller, Zachary)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Federal Trade Commission (Keller, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Sunrise Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Edgar Hipol Sevilla
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Meis
Represented By: David R. McNamara
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Represented By: Michael F Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huu Tieu
Represented By: Edgar Hipol Sevilla
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Sunrise Nutraceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Edgar Hipol Sevilla
Represented By: Joseph La Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Keller, GOVT
Represented By: Reid Abram Tepfer, GOVT
Represented By: Edward Hynes, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?