(HC) Williams v. United States District Court
Petitioner: Patrick Williams
Respondent: United States District Court
Case Number: 1:2020cv01143
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Patrick Williams. (Rivera, O)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/5/2020. Consent or Decline due by within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
September 15, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Patrick Williams. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Address Changed to reflect the information listed on the CDC Inmate Locator. CDCR# and Name of Facility has been changed to: Patrick Williams, CDCR# F-30649, California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility (5242), P.O. Box 5242, Corcoran, CA 93212-5242. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 14, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, #4 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend sent to Patrick Williams. Notice of Change of Address due by 11/23/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Patrick Williams. (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING Petition WITH LEAVE TO FILE an AMENDED PETITION; Amended Petition Due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)(Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Patrick Williams. (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Patrick Williams signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/18/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against United States District Court by Patrick Williams.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Williams v. United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?