(PC) Stanfield v. CA Correctional Health Care Services et al
Plaintiff: Micah C. Stanfield
Defendant: Tai and CA Correctional Health Care Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv01145
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Screening Order served on Micah C. Stanfield. (Rivera, O)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2020. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
September 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Micah C. Stanfield. (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-01145-NONE-SAB (PC). (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Micah C. Stanfield. (Jessen, A)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Micah C. Stanfield. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Micah C. Stanfield (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order, served on Micah C. Stanfield. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Micah C. Stanfield, CDC BL-0656 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-07121.
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: INTER-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Accordingly, in the interest of justice, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); see also 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (clee) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Micah C. Stanfield. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Micah C. Stanfield against Defendants CA Correctional Health Care Services and Dr. Tai, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Stanfield v. CA Correctional Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah C. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?