(SS) Gonzalez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jose Morales Gonzalez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01146
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jose Morales Gonzalez. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. Accordingly, the Court HEREBY ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the August 18, 2020 order. Plaintiff is forewarned that the failure to show cause may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions and the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2020. (Hernandez, M)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Long Form Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2020.( IFP-Long Form or Pay Filing Fee: 20-Day Deadline ) (Attachments: #1 IFP Applicaiton -Long Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose Morales Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jose Morales Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Gonzalez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Morales Gonzalez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?