(HC) Luedtke v. Ciolli
Petitioner: James Luedtke
Respondent: A. Ciolli
Case Number: 1:2020cv01148
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on James Luedtke. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/05/2020. Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2020 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Judge by James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner James Luedtke. (Rivera, O)
September 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion)and #8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on James Luedtke. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Dismissed re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for Order; referred to Judge Drozd; New Case No. 1:20-cv-1148 DAD-EPG (HC),signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/11/2020. (Objections to F&R due within 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1148 DAD-EPG (HC). (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #7 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to James Luedtke signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/18/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re Financial Affidavit by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Recusal by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Order re Trust Account Statement by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against A. Ciolli by James Luedtke. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Luedtke v. Ciolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Luedtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Ciolli
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?