(HC) Dynes v. Clark
Petitioner: John Ray Dynes
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 1:2020cv01149
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #4 by Petitioner John Ray Dynes. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
August 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on John Ray Dynes. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Court Dismiss the Petition #1 and DECLINE to Issue a Certificate of Appealability re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; new case number 1:20-cv-01149 AWI-JDP (HC); referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/23/2020. Objections to F&R due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on John Ray Dynes. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to John Ray Dynes signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/18/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ken Clark by John Ray Dynes. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Dynes v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Ray Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?