Vela v. City of Porterville et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Defendant: City of Porterville, Porterville Police Department and Sgt. Ron Moore
Case Number: 1:2020cv01151
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations, served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Gonzalez, R)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending Plaintiff's #6 Amended Complaint be Dismissed; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending Denying Plaintiff's #5 Petition for Guardian as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/20. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Isabel Valdez Vela.(Marrujo, C)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Marrujo, C)
September 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order to Show Cause served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Rosales, O.)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Plaintiff to Show Cause why this action should not be dismissed as barred by the statue of limitations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/11/2020. Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2020.(Rosales, O.)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/19/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Porterville, Ron Moore, Porterville Police Department by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela v. City of Porterville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Porterville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porterville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ron Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?