Vela v. County of Tulare Superior Court
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Defendant: County of Tulare Superior Court
Case Number: 1:2020cv01153
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Order served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Lundstrom, T)
August 31, 2020 MAIL RETURNED as RTS, No Such Number, Unable to Forward: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to Isabel Vela at 1800 S. Mooney Blvd, Suite 101 Visalia, CA 93722. (Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. It is HEREBY ORDERED that: Within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint; and if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in compliance with this order, the Court will recommend to the district judge that this action be dismissed consistent with the reasons stated in this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/25/2020. (Apodaca, P)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Isabel Valdez Vela. (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
August 19, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Tulare Superior Court by Isabel Valdez Vela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vela v. County of Tulare Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Valdez Vela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?