(SS) Carbajal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01157
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-01157-GSA. (Gonzalez, R)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (**TEXT ENTRY ONLY**), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/2020. The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10. (Apodaca, P)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare Street, Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/19/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Carbajal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Esparza Carbajal
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?