Bien v. City of Fresno
Plaintiff: John Bien
Defendant: City of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2020cv01159
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) The MOTION TO DISMISS Doc. No. #8 , currently set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM, is RESET for 1:30PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/15/2020.(Gonzales, V)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by City of Fresno. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Jeffcoach, Mandy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): In light of the restrictions on entering the Courthouse, and General Orders 610, 611, 612, 617 and 618, the parties are ordered to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Tuesday, November 17, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Parties may appear telephonically by using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3219139. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/28/2020. (Valdez, E)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by City of Fresno. Attorney Jeffcoach, Mandy Louise added. (Jeffcoach, Mandy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION to Attorney, Nathan S. Miller re #4 Notice - Other. When filing a proof of service of the Summons and Complaint, you must use the event Summons Returned Executed under the Service of Process category. For a proof of service as to all other documents, use the event Certificate of Service. Please re-file your document using the correct event. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Lundstrom, T)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Proof of Service by John Bien. (Miller, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Fresno* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nathan S. Miller* *Miller & Ayala, LLP* *191 W. Shaw, Suite 102* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by John Bien. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9060926) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bien v. City of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bien
Represented By: Nathan S. Miller
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno
Represented By: Mandy Louise Jeffcoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?