Montes et al v. Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Octaviano Montalvo, Maria Diaz and Daniel Montes
Defendant: Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Eduardo Soto and Harvest Kings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01162
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency #3 -2, the recently-filed motions to dismiss #15 #16 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing(s) will be calendared, and the matters will be decided on the papers. The hearing dates chosen by the filing parties serve only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the court's extraordinarily heavy caseload. The parties are warned that civil motions and trials set before district judges in this district are likely to experience significant delays due to judicial resource shortages. The parties are encouraged to reconsider consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction over this action for all purposes signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on October 16, 2020. (Munoz, I)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jim Marderosian In Support of Motion)(Campagne, Thomas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Daniel Montes. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Kingsley, Eric)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mario Martinez on behalf of Maria Diaz, Octaviano Montalvo, Daniel Montes. Attorney Martinez, Mario added. (Martinez, Mario)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of State Statute by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. (Campagne, Thomas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 CROSSCLAIM against Harvest Kings, LLC, Eduardo Soto by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D)(Campagne, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Campagne, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 CROSSCLAIM against Harvest Kings, LLC, Eduardo Soto by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D)(Campagne, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM against Maria Diaz, Octaviano Montalvo, Daniel Montes by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc..(Campagne, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. Attorney Campagne, Thomas Elmer added.(Campagne, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants., SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to All Defendants. (Szamet, Kelsey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Szamet, Kelsey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Szamet, Kelsey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Szamet, Kelsey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelsey Szamet* *Kingsley & Kingsley, APC* *16133 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200* *Encino, CA 91436*. (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9061823 for $400.00 for Plaintiff's from Kelsey Szamet. (Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants by Daniel Montes, Maria Diaz, Octaviano Montalvo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szamet, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes et al v. Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octaviano Montalvo
Represented By: Kelsey Szamet
Represented By: Edgar Ivan Aguilasocho
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Diaz
Represented By: Kelsey Szamet
Represented By: Edgar Ivan Aguilasocho
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Montes
Represented By: Kelsey Szamet
Represented By: Edgar Ivan Aguilasocho
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Elmer Campagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eduardo Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Harvest Kings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?