(PC) Jerry Dillingham v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Dillingham
Defendant: A. Felder, R. Soto, C. Pfeiffer, C. Lerma, E. Wilson, F. Garcia, D. Ybarra, S. Gates, R. Diaz, M. Faulkner and A. Flores
Case Number: 1:2020cv01164
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Jerry Dillingham. (Rivera, O)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/5/2020. Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
September 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jerry Dillingham. (Jessen, A)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 , #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jerry Dillingham. (Jessen, A)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jerry Dillingham. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Jerry Dillingham. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on KVSP. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/19/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Diaz, M. Faulkner, A. Felder, A. Flores, F. Garcia, S. Gates, C. Lerma, C. Pfeiffer, R. Soto, E. Wilson, D. Ybarra by Jerry Dillingham.(Martin-Gill, S) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin-Gill, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jerry Dillingham v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lerma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?