(SS) Black v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Claressa Lavoie Black
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01166
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-01166-EPG. (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Haley, Denise)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Claressa Lavoie Black. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haley, Denise)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Denise Bourgeois Haley* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Jessen, A)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/13/2020. (Jessen, A)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The stay pursuant to General Order Number 615 is temporarily lifted for the limited purposes of addressing the pending application to proceed in forma pauperis, issuing the summons, and allowing Plaintiff to effectuate service of process. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/2/2020. (Rooney, M)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, attached hereto, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/20/2020. (Rooney, M)
August 19, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Claressa Lavoie Black. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haley, Denise)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Claressa Lavoie Black. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haley, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Black v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claressa Lavoie Black
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?