(SS) Madrigal Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Griselda Madrigal Garcia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01173
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-1173-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jenkins, Chantal)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF STAY OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 615. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2020. (Hernandez, M)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Griselda Madrigal Garcia pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 SAB SOC SEC, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM SS Instructions) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Griselda Madrigal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Griselda Madrigal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Madrigal Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griselda Madrigal Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?