Nam v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kitae Nam
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01273
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Crowe, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorney Crowe, Jeffrey S. added.(Crowe, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Kerley, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kerley, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Safeco Insurance Company of America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Edward Kerley, Jr.* *Kerley Schaffer, LLP* *1939 Harrison Street, Suite 150* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Rivera, O)
September 8, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9099592 for $400.00 for Kitae Nam from Kerley, John Edward, Jr. (Rivera, O)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America by Kitae Nam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kerley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nam v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kitae Nam
Represented By: John Edward Kerley, Jr.
Represented By: Reuthana Tap
Represented By: Dylan L. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?