Garza, Jr. v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Everardo Garza, Jr.
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. Doing business as WinCo Foods
Case Number: 1:2020cv01354
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* to Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta for all further proceedings. (Maldonado, C)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY by Everardo Garza, Jr. re #10 Motion to Remand. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPPOSITION by WinCo Holdings, Inc. to #10 Motion to Remand. (Ebsworth, Phillip)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) The motion hearing scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 9:30am is continued to 11/12/2020 at 2pm. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/29/2020. (Dunbar-Kari, K)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY by WinCo Holdings, Inc. to RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Kopp, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY): #10 MOTION to REMAND set for 11/19/2020 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on October 23, 2020. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. (Munoz, I)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to REMAND by Everardo Garza, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Everardo Garza, Jr. to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency issued September 24, 2020 #4 -2, the recently-filed motion to dismiss #7 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload. The parties are warned that civil motions and trials set before district judges in this district are likely to experience significant delays due to judicial resource shortages. All parties are encouraged to consider magistrate judge consent signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on October 8, 2020. (Munoz, I)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by WinCo Holdings, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Noitce)(Kopp, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by No More Than 28 Days by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Kopp, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil New Case Documents,. (Kwan, Sophia)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc., dba WinCo Foods. (Kwan, Sophia)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number CV-20-003604 by WinCo Holdings, Inc., dba WinCo Foods. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9136052) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elison ISO Removal)(Kwan, Sophia)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WinCo Holdings, Inc., dba WinCo Foods (Kwan, Sophia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza, Jr. v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. Doing business as WinCo Foods
Represented By: Michael Warner Kopp
Represented By: Alfred L. Sanderson
Represented By: Sophia Kwan
Represented By: Phillip James Ebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo Garza, Jr.
Represented By: Mehrdad Bokhour
Represented By: Joshua S. Falakassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?