(PC) Washington v. Yaplee
Plaintiff: Robert Washington
Defendant: Steven M. Yaplee
Case Number: 1:2020cv01356
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 9/24/2020,* on * Steven M. Yaplee*, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/21/2020. Service Deadline set for 1/22/2021. (Rivera, O)
October 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Directing Service by USM served on Robert Washington. (Rivera, O)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 3 copies of the complaint, by Robert Washington. (Sant Agata, S)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER ALLOWING Plaintiff's Complaint to Proceed on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Claim Against Defendant Yaplee for Deliberate Indifference to Plaintiff's Serious Medical Needs, Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff to Complete and Return Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/7/2020. Service is appropriate for Steven M. Yaplee. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions) (Rivera, O)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
October 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Robert Washington. (Rivera, O)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/28/20. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
September 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert Washington. (Maldonado, C)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Steven M. Yaplee by Robert Washington. (SIGNED COPY) (Rivera, O)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CCI. (Maldonado, C)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/24/2020*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Washington. (Maldonado, C)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Steven M. Yaplee by Robert Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Washington v. Yaplee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Yaplee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?