(PC) Harris v. Robles et al
Plaintiff: Devonte B. Harris
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, J. Garcia, A. Robles, Matthew Late and Velasquez
Case Number: 1:2020cv01406
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee or submit IFP Application by 1/3/2021 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion for Extension served on Devonte B. Harris. (Lundstrom, T)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Devonte B. Harris. (Lundstrom, T)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Devonte B. Harris. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/2/2020*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Ralph Diaz, J. Garcia, Matthew Late, A. Robles, Velasquez by Devonte B. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Harris v. Robles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Late
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?