Dailey v. LinkUs Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Dailey
Defendant: LinkUs Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01407
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jessica Dailey. (Taylor, Charles)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. The Scheduling Conference is continued from 11/24/2020 to 11/30/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven days prior to the continued date. (Hernandez, M)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Jessica Dailey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference)(Taylor, Charles)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant LinkUs Enterprises, LLC. (Tillman, Christina)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tillman, Christina)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Taylor, Charles)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LinkUs Enterprises, LLC (Tillman, Christina)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by LinkUs Enterprises, LLC. (Tillman, Christina)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Christina Tillman: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by LinkUs Enterprises, LLC. (Tillman, Christina)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 20CECG02419 by LinkUs Enterprises, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9156980) (Tillman, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dailey v. LinkUs Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkUs Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Kristine Cerro
Represented By: Christina Cusimano Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Dailey
Represented By: Charles Trudrung Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?