Santiago v. CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jonathan Santiago
Defendant: CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01413
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY by Jonathan Santiago re #7 Motion to Remand,. (Zabehi, Tara)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company re #6 Motion to Compel,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Michael Reagan In Support of Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike the Class Allegations, and Stay Action, #2 Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Michael Reagan ( Plaintiff's Offer Letter), #3 Response Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of Michael Reagan in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike the Class Allegations, and Stay Action, #4 Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company's Objections to Declarations of Heather Davis and Jonathan Santiago, #5 Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company re #11 Opposition to Motion,. (Jimenez, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company to #7 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Chambers In Support of Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Carlos)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Jonathan Santiago to #6 Motion to Compel,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Jonathan Santiago, #2 Declaration of Heather Davis, Esq., #3 Objections to Defendant's Evidence, #4 Proposed Order)(Davis, Heather)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Heather Davis,Amir Nayebdadash for Jonathan Santiago. (Aiwazian, Edwin)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #7 Motion to Remand,. (Zabehi, Tara)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand by Jonathan Santiago. Attorney Zabehi, Tara added. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Zabehi, Tara)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration, Strike the Class Allegations, and Stay Action by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Carlos Jimenez In Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Allegations, and Stay Action, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez - Meet and Confer correspondence, #4 Declaration of Michael Reagan in Support of Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike the Class Allegations, and Stay Action, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Reagan- Relevant pages from CIGNA Employee Handbook, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Reagan- Plaintiff's Acknowledgment of Employee Handbook including Arbitration Policy, #7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Reagan - CIGNA Companies EDR Rules and Procedures, #8 Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Carlos)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 Civil New Case Documents, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company, an unknown business entity;. (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company, an unknown business entity; (Jimenez, Carlos)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare Superior Court, case number 284004 by CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9158239) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Jimenez in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez - Class Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez - Service Documents, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Carlos Jimenez - Answer to Complaint with filing submission transmittal, #5 Declaration of Jason Chambers in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Jimenez, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Santiago
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Heather Davis
Represented By: Amir Nayebdadash
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health & Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Linda Nguyen Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?