(SS) Carson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shelly Renee Carson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01416
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/30/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-01416-SKO(SS). (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Talbert, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Shelly Renee Carson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Lawrence David Rohlfing* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Lifting Stay to Permit Service Upon Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2020. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): Pursuant to General Order 615, this action is STAYED pending further Order of the Court. No summons or briefing schedule will issue until the stay is lifted. (Marrujo, C)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Shelly Renee Carson. Attorney Rohlfing, Lawrence David added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 5, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-9160261. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Carson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Renee Carson
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?