Acevedo v. Russell Cellular, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marco Acevedo
Defendant: Russell Cellular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01440
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration the Scheduling Conference is reset from 11/24/2020 to 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. (Hernandez, M)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Russell Cellular, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victor T. Xu ISO MTC, #3 Declaration of Robert Lister ISO MTC, #4 Proposed Order)(Xu, Victor)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Victor Xu re #3 Notice to Adverse Party: When filing a Certificate of Service, please use the event Certificate of Service under the category, Service of Process. Do not use the generic Notice event when a more specific event is available. Please re-file your document using the correct event. (Rivera, O)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 20C-0246 by Russell Cellular, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9169782) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Corporate Disclosure)(Woo, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo v. Russell Cellular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Acevedo
Represented By: Michael Freiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Cellular, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Woo
Represented By: Victor Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?