(SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marilyn Lou Lopez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01445
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare Street* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/14/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
October 13, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Rivera, O)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marilyn Lou Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Marilyn Lou Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Lou Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?