Romero v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Samuel Romero
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01490
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Karajah, Adolpho)
October 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, #5 Notice served on Abraham Mathew, NCAED. (Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney, Abraham Mathew to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California.(Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
October 20, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-9192686. (Karajah, Adolpho)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Adolpho O. Karajah re #2 Notice of Removal: Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event Payment of Fees. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 20CECG01276 by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Karajah, Adolpho)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc (Karajah, Adolpho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Romero
Represented By: Jacob Kadavil George
Represented By: Abraham Mathew, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory L. Spallas
Represented By: Adolpho Oliveira Karajah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?