(HC) Richson v. Clark
Petitioner: Sean Jeffrey Richson
Respondent: K. Clark
Case Number: 1:2020cv01502
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sean Jeffrey Richson. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Sean Jeffrey Richson signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/23/2020. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-09695.
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (see document for details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 10/23/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 CV-69 IFP) (car) [Transferred from cacd on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Sean Jeffrey Richson. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Richson v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Jeffrey Richson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?