Nico Cruz v. Mohawk Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nico Cruz
Defendant: Daltile Services, Inc., Dal-Tile Services, Inc., Dal-Tile Corporation and Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01510
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/7/2020. As a Motion for Remand has been filed, document #7 , with a ruling to be issued without oral argument, the Court vacates the Initial Scheduling Conference currently noticed for 2/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Grosjean. If the matter is not remanded, within ten days of the ruling on same, the parties are directed to contact Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to set another scheduling conference. (Text Only Entry) (Rooney, M)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency issued October 27, 2020 #4 -2, the recently-filed motion to remand #7 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload. The parties are warned that civil motions and trials set before district judges in this district are likely to experience significant delays due to judicial resource shortages. The parties are encouraged to reconsider consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction over this action for all purposes signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on December 4, 2020. (Munoz, I)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Nico Cruz. Attorney Klein, Jeffrey D. added. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Klein in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447)(Klein, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services, Inc., Daltile Services, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc.. (Jauregui, Jesus)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court's Order)(Jauregui, Jesus)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services, Inc., Daltile Services, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Jauregui, Jesus)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney, Jesus Manuel Jauregui regarding Civil Cover Sheet. Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Lundstrom, T)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 20CECG02675 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9201309) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jesse M. Jauregui, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration Robin Krueger, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service, #9 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons)(Jauregui, Jesus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nico Cruz v. Mohawk Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daltile Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Jauregui
Represented By: Kelsey Kathleen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dal-Tile Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Jauregui
Represented By: Kelsey Kathleen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dal-Tile Corporation
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Jauregui
Represented By: Kelsey Kathleen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Ian A. Wright
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Jauregui
Represented By: Kelsey Kathleen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nico Cruz
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?