(PC) Cruz v. Pfeiffer et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo Trujillo Cruz
Defendant: Quinonez, W.J. Sullivan, C. Pfeiffer and T.S. Arlitz
Case Number: 1:2020cv01522
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Rivera, O)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #4 Findings and Recommendations, and DIRECTING Plaintiff to Pay the $400 Filing Fee in Full Within Twenty-One Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/2020. (Rivera, O)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to #4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Rivera, O)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Rivera, O)
November 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion for Extension served on Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2020. (Objections to F&R due within 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for 35-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations re #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), by Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to randomly assign a District Judge to this case. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to court regarding past submissions of complaint by Guillermo Trujillo Cruz. (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Guillermo Trujillo Cruz (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against T.S. Arlitz, C. Pfeiffer, Quinonez, W.J. Sullivan by Guillermo Trujillo Cruz.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cruz v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.S. Arlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Trujillo Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?