Owens v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chrystal Owens
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01536
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Bowden, Lindsay)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lyman, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chrystal Owens. (Bowden, Lindsay)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Chrystal Owens. (Bowden, Lindsay)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher Paul Brandes on behalf of Chrystal Owens. Attorney Brandes, Christopher Paul added. (Brandes, Christopher)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lindsay Leigh Bowden on behalf of Chrystal Owens. Attorney Bowden, Lindsay Leigh added. (Bowden, Lindsay)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Lyman, Daniel)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number 284295 by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9212840) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Lyman, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Richard Lyman
Represented By: Timothy L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystal Owens
Represented By: Christopher Paul Brandes
Represented By: D. Aaron Brock
Represented By: Timothy John Gonzales
Represented By: Lindsay Leigh Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?