Avalos v. Wa Re, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Defendant: Troy A. McKenney, Debra A. McKenny and Wa Re, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01572
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by George Avalos. (Manning, Joseph)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond to Initial Complaint by Wa Re, Inc.. Attorney Karlin, Michael J. added. (Karlin, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Troy A. McKenney, Debra A. McKenny. Attorney Fike, David Alan added.(Fike, David)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Debra A. McKenny served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Troy A. McKenney served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Wa Re, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Troy A. McKenney, Debra A. McKenny, Wa Re, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *Manning Law, APC* *20062 SW Birch Street, Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Rivera, O)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9230445) (Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. Wa Re, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy A. McKenney
Represented By: David Alan Fike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. McKenny
Represented By: David Alan Fike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wa Re, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Represented By: Joseph R. Manning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?